Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carolus Salvatori

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1627³Born
28 Nov 168962.6AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
13 Apr 169265.0DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carolus Salvatori
Bishop Carolus Salvatori (born , died ) Bishop of Assisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonte Leoni

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 101
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1689, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast