Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Salhausen

Deceased

Bishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1444Born
12 Nov 148743.0SelectedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
8 Feb 148843.2ConfirmedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
10 Apr 151873.4DiedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Johann Salhausen (VIAF: 69747427)
Bishop Johann Salhausen (born , died ) Bishop of Meißen (Meissen)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThammenhain

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 247
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 194
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1488, Number 10*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Dec 2018

Quantcast