Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Charles de Salettes

Deceased

Bishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1641¹BornLescar
16 Jan 168241.0SelectedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
20 Apr 168241.3AppointedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
22 Jul 170463.5DiedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Charles de Salettes:
Bishop François-Charles de Salettes (born 1641, died ) Bishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie)

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 296
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1682, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015