Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Salcedo Benacos

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1575Born
20 Oct 163863.3SelectedBishop of Astorga, Spain
11 Apr 163963.8ConfirmedBishop of Astorga, Spain
28 Mar 164468.8DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Diego Salcedo Benacos
Bishop Diego Salcedo Benacos (born , died ) Bishop of Astorga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHuete

Source(s):
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,968
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 99
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 168, Number 1,050
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1639, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast