Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikolaus Sachau (Sachow)

Deceased

Bishop of Lübeck, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1385¹Born
24 Oct 143954.8SelectedBishop of Lübeck, Germany
7 Nov 143954.8ConfirmedBishop of Lübeck, Germany
16 Jan 144055.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lübeck, Germany
11 Oct 144964.7DiedBishop of Lübeck, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nikolaus Sachau (Sachow)
Bishop Nikolaus Sachau (Sachow) (born 1385, died ) Bishop of Lübeck

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLübeck

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,288
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,605
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 180

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast