Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Divo Angelo Maria Sabatini, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1912Born
21 Jul 193523.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
9 Oct 197058.6SelectedAbbot of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy
5 Dec 197058.8ConfirmedAbbot of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy
198673.8ResignedAbbot of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy
15 Jan 198976.9DiedAbbot Emeritus of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy

MicroData Summary for Divo Angelo Maria Sabatini
Abbot Divo Angelo Maria Sabatini O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Monte Oliveto Maggiore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbbadia San Salvatore, Archdiocese of Siena

  • a priest for 53.4 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Apr 2021

Quantcast