Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Maximilien Ryłło, S.J. †

Deceased

Pro-Vicar Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}, Sudan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1802Born
29 Dec 183330.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
18 Apr 184744.2AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}, Sudan
17 Jun 184845.4DiedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}, Sudan

MicroData Summary for Maximilien Ryłło (VIAF: 163438767)
Father Maximilien Ryłło S.J. (born , died ) Pro-Vicar Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrodno, Poland

  • a priest for 14.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast