Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mikołaj Rusin, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl


Events

DateEventTitle
14 May 1352SelectedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
18 Jan 1353ConfirmedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
23 Aug 1354³Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
1375DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Mikołaj Rusin:
Bishop Mikołaj Rusin O.P. , Bishop of Przemyśl

  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 409
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,223

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 1 Oct 2014