Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Ruyu

Deceased

Bishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1663³Born
15 Mar 168723.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Dec 168724.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Nov 172662.9SelectedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
17 Mar 172763.3ConfirmedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
Jan 1728³64.0DiedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Ruyu
Bishop Salvatore Ruyu (born , died Jan 1728) Bishop of Ales e Terralba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBosa

  • a priest for 40.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 401
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast