Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Ruistre

Deceased

Bishop of Arras, France


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Feb 1502AppointedBishop of Arras, France
7 Aug 1502Ordained BishopBishop of Arras, France
5 Nov 1509DiedBishop of Arras, France

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Ruistre
Bishop Nicolas Ruistre (died ) Bishop of Arras

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLuxembourg
Ordained BishopSt. Pierre, Church, Louvain
Death PlaceMalines

  • a bishop for 7.2 years

Source(s):
  • b/c3: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,502, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast