Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gaetano Cardinal de Ruggiero

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1816Born
24 May 188973.3Elevated to Cardinal
27 May 188973.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
9 Oct 189680.7DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin

MicroData Summary for Gaetano de Ruggiero
Gaetano Cardinal de Ruggiero (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNaples, Italy

  • a cardinal for 7.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 54
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 May 1889

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast