Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Ruffino

Deceased

Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Apr 1548AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
1557¹SucceededBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
24 May 1574ResignedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
26 Jul 1579DiedBishop Emeritus of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Ruffino
Bishop Alessandro Ruffino (died ) Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 241
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1548, Number 10*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018