Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert de Rouvres

Deceased

Bishop of Maguelonne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Dec 1422AppointedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
6 Mar 1433AppointedBishop of Maguelonne, France
16 Jul 1453DiedBishop of Maguelonne, France

MicroData Summary for Robert de Rouvres
Bishop Robert de Rouvres (died ) Bishop of Maguelonne

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 226, and Page 183

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast