Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Rothe

Deceased

Bishop of Ossory


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1573¹BornKilkenny
160027.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 161845.7AppointedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
1 Apr 161946.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ossory, Ireland
20 Apr 165077.3DiedBishop of Ossory, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for David Rothe:
Bishop David Rothe (died ) Bishop of Ossory

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 267
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1619, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 23 Feb 2015