Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Markus Rossetti

Deceased

Bishop of Pedena, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1626³Born
20 Apr 168761.0SelectedBishop of Pedena, Austria
12 Dec 168963.7ConfirmedBishop of Pedena, Austria
24 Feb 169063.9Ordained BishopBishop of Pedena, Austria
10 Nov 169165.6DiedBishop of Pedena, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Markus Rossetti
Bishop Johann Markus Rossetti (born , died ) Bishop of Pedena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLjubljana

  • a bishop for 1.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 311
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast