Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ludovico Maria Roselli, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1742BornOratino
Nov 1765³23.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
8 May 181875.5SelectedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
2 Oct 181875.9ConfirmedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
15 Oct 1818³75.9DiedBishop-Elect of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Maria Roselli
Father Ludovico Maria Roselli O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso)

  • a priest for 52.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 207
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 May 2016