Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ottavio Roncioni

Deceased

Bishop of Ferentino


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jul 1658AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
25 Jul 1658Ordained BishopBishop of Ferentino, Italy
2 Jul 1676DiedBishop of Ferentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Roncioni (VIAF: 307325579)
Bishop Ottavio Roncioni (died ) Bishop of Ferentino

  • a bishop for 17.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 186
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1658, Number 34
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,877

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Jul 2016