Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal Rolin

Deceased

Bishop of Autun, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1408²Born
29 May 143123.4SelectedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
7 Sep 143123.6ConfirmedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
20 Aug 143628.6AppointedBishop of Autun, France
20 Dec 144840.9Elevated to Cardinal
3 Jan 144941.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
22 Jun 148375.4DiedBishop of Autun, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Rolin
Jean Cardinal Rolin (born 1408, died ) Bishop of Autun

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAutun

  • a cardinal for 34.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1448
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 112

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast