Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Rocamora, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1596BornOrihuela
20 Jul 164448.6SelectedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
14 Nov 164448.9ConfirmedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
164549.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mallorca, Spain
15 Nov 165357.9DiedBishop of Mallorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Tomás Rocamora:
Bishop Tomás Rocamora O.P. (died ) Bishop of Mallorca

  • a bishop for 8.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 228

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 20 Dec 2013