Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Roberto Giovanni F. Cardinal Roberti

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1788Born
30 Sep 185061.7Elevated to Cardinal
3 Oct 185061.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
16 Mar 186374.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres
7 Nov 186778.8DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Roberto Giovanni F. Roberti
Roberto Giovanni F. Cardinal Roberti (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Giusto, Italy

  • a cardinal for 17.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 54, and Page 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018