Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Youssef Rizzi el-Bkoufani

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite)

Note/Previous Titular See: (Caesarea (Baniyas) of the Maronites)


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Dec 1595Ordained BishopBishop
16 Oct 1596SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
Mar 1608³DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Youssef Rizzi el-Bkoufani:
Patriarch Youssef Rizzi el-Bkoufani , Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 86
  • b/ob/c2: CB, 26 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 28 Apr 2014