Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Riquelme y Quirós

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1608¹Born
2 Dec 165850.9AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
1659²51.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
14 Aug 166153.6SelectedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
19 Dec 166153.9ConfirmedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
23 Feb 166557.1AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
13 May 166860.3DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Riquelme y Quirós
Bishop Diego Riquelme y Quirós (born 1608, died ) Bishop of Plasencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanlúcar de Barrameda

  • a bishop for 9.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 190, Number 1,194
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 282, and Page 268
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 151
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast