Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolaus Righetti

Deceased

Bishop of Martirano (Martoranum)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1646BornS. Mauri
19 Feb 170356.2AppointedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
Mar 171164.2DiedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicolaus Righetti:
Bishop Nicolaus Righetti (born ) Bishop of Martirano (Martoranum)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013