Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Niccol˛ Cardinal Ridolfi

Deceased

Administrator of Vicenza, Italy

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1501Born
1 Jul 151716.5Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jul 151716.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
24 Aug 152019.6AppointedAdministrator of Orvieto, Italy
22 Nov 152322.8AppointedAdministrator of Pomesania (Pomezania), Poland
1524¹23.0ResignedAdministrator of Pomesania (Pomezania), Poland
11 Jan 152423.0AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
14 Mar 152423.2AppointedAdministrator of Vicenza, Italy
16 Apr 152625.2AppointedAdministrator of Forli, Italy
7 Aug 152827.5ResignedAdministrator of Forli, Italy
3 Sep 152928.6ResignedAdministrator of Orvieto, Italy
11 Oct 153231.7ResignedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
16 Nov 153231.8AppointedAdministrator of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
7 Feb 153332.0AppointedAdministrator of Salerno, Italy
6 Jun 153332.4ResignedAdministrator of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
4 Aug 153332.5AppointedAdministrator of Imola, Italy
19 Jan 153433.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
8 Aug 153837.6AppointedAdministrator of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
31 May 154039.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
8 Jan 154342.0AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
17 May 154645.3ResignedAdministrator of Imola, Italy
25 May 154847.3ResignedAdministrator of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
25 May 154847.3ResignedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
19 Dec 154847.9ResignedAdministrator of Salerno, Italy
31 Jan 155049.0DiedAdministrator of Vicenza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niccol˛ Ridolfi (VIAF: 89407540)
Niccol˛ Cardinal Ridolfi (born 1501, died ) Administrator of Vicenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 32.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 289, and Page 333
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 198, and Page 213
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 336, and Page 335
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,524, Number 1*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast