Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Riccardi

Deceased

Bishop of Pesaro, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Jan 1499AppointedBishop of Ostuni, Italy
27 Mar 1504AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
24 Sep 1508DiedBishop of Pesaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Riccardi
Bishop Francesco Riccardi (died ) Bishop of Pesaro

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 274, and Page 265
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 208

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Dec 2018

Quantcast