Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ruprecht von Rhein (Bayern-Moosbach)

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Regensburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1437Born
4 Sep 145719.7AppointedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
1 Sep 146527.7DiedBishop-Elect of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ruprecht von Rhein (Bayern-Moosbach)
Father Ruprecht von Rhein (Bayern-Moosbach) (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Regensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHeidelberg

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1457

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Aug 2018

Quantcast