Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Charles-René Renou, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Prefect of Lhassa, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1812Born
14 Sep 183624.0ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
20 May 183724.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
21 Mar 185340.5AppointedPrefect of Lhassa, China
18 Oct 186351.1DiedPrefect of Lhassa, China

MicroData Summary for Charles-René Renou
Father Charles-René Renou M.E.P. (born , died ) Prefect of Lhassa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVernantes, Diocese of Angers, France
Death PlaceKiangka

  • a priest for 26.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast