Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Rehwinkel, O.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Samland (Sambia), Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Dec 1474AppointedBishop of Samland (Sambia), Poland
15 May 1475Ordained BishopBishop of Samland (Sambia), Poland
22 Feb 1497DiedBishop of Samland (Sambia), Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Rehwinkel
Bishop Jan Rehwinkel O.T. (died ) Bishop of Samland (Sambia)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Maria dell`Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 21.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 229
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,358
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,475, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast