Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonino Reggio

Deceased

Bishop of Lipari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1738BornMessina
19 Sep 176122.9Ordained PriestPriest
29 Oct 180466.0AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
30 Dec 180466.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
14 Dec 180668.1DiedBishop of Lipari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonino Reggio:
Bishop Antonino Reggio (born , died ) Bishop of Lipari

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,515
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013