Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Egidio Recchi

Deceased

Bishop of Acquapendente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1656BornCastignano
28 Oct 170347.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Nov 170347.1Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jan 171154.4AppointedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
24 Feb 171154.4Ordained BishopBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
Feb 1728³71.4DiedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Egidio Recchi:
Bishop Bernardino Egidio Recchi (born , died Feb 1728) Bishop of Acquapendente

  • a priest for 24.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 92
  • ob: CB, 3 Jul 2013
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,821
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015