Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Augustin Ravoux, S.J. †

Deceased

Priest of Society of Jesus

Titular See: (refused)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1815Born
5 Jan 184024.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
3 Mar 186853.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Montana, USA
3 Mar 186853.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Limyra
17 Jan 190691.0DiedPriest of Society of Jesus

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Augustin Ravoux (VIAF: 66060982)
Father Augustin Ravoux S.J. (born , died ) Priest of Society of Jesus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLangeac, France
Ordained PriestDubuque, Diocese of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
Death PlaceSaint Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA

  • a priest for 66.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017