Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Rauch, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Athyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1495¹Born
22 Aug 154651.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
22 Aug 154651.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Athyra
28 Feb 154752.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Athyra
2 Nov 155863.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Rauch (VIAF: 32792830)
Bishop Peter Rauch O.P. (born 1495, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnsbach

  • a bishop for 11.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 254
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,334
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1547, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast