Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emich von Baumberg (Raugraf)

Deceased

Bishop of Worms, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Apr 1294Ordained BishopBishop of Worms, Germany
22 Dec 1294AppointedBishop of Worms, Germany
24 Jun 1299DiedBishop of Worms, Germany

MicroData Summary for Emich von Baumberg (Raugraf)
Bishop Emich von Baumberg (Raugraf) (died ) Bishop of Worms

  • a bishop for 5.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 534
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,187

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast