Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm von Raron

Deceased

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1407²Born
24 Apr 143730.3SelectedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
2 Jun 143730.4ConfirmedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
9 Nov 143932.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
11 Jan 145144.0DiedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm von Raron:
Bishop Wilhelm von Raron (died ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

  • a bishop for 11.2 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,896

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014