Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Marquard von Randeck

Deceased

Patriarch of Aquileia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1300¹Born
30 May 134848.4AppointedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
13 Apr 1354³54.2Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
23 Aug 136565.6AppointedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
3 Jan 138181.0DiedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marquard von Randeck (VIAF: 10702666)
Patriarch Marquard von Randeck (born 1300, died ) Patriarch of Aquileia

EventPlace
Ordained BishopKaisheim

  • a bishop for 26.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 116, and Page 99
  • ob: ATh, 13 Feb 2018
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,649

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast