Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bernhard von Raesfeld

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Münster


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1508Born
4 Dec 155749.0SelectedBishop of Münster, Germany
23 Dec 155850.1ConfirmedBishop of Münster, Germany
25 Oct 156657.9ResignedBishop-Elect of Münster, Germany
18 Apr 157465.4DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Bernhard von Raesfeld:
Father Bernhard von Raesfeld (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Münster

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015