Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Angelo Radovani

Deceased

Bishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1761¹Born
27 Jun 179635.4AppointedBishop of SapŽ, Albania
8 Jul 180847.5AppointedBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania
3 May 181453.3DiedBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Angelo Radovani
Bishop Antonio Angelo Radovani (born 1761, died ) Bishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShkodrŽ

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 367
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 337
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1796, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast