Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raimondo Quesada

Deceased

Bishop of Bosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1702²BornSassari
19 Jan 175048.0AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
12 Apr 1750³48.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bosa, Italy
2 Mar 175856.2DiedBishop of Bosa, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raimondo Quesada:
Bishop Raimondo Quesada (died ) Bishop of Bosa

  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1752
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob/c2: CB, 17 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 18 Jan 2014