Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Jean Jodoc Quartéry, C.R.A. †

Deceased

Abbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1608³Born
11 Aug 165749.5SelectedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
24 May 165951.3ConfirmedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
4 Aug 166961.5DiedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Jodoc Quartéry
Abbot Jean Jodoc Quartéry C.R.A. (born , died ) Abbot of Saint-Maurice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt-Maurice

Source(s):
  • b: Google Books, 2,015, 11, 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast