Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich Christian von Plettenberg zu Lenhausen

Deceased

Bishop of Münster


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1644BornLenhausen
20 Jun 168843.9Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
29 Jul 168844.0SelectedBishop of Münster, Germany
20 Dec 168844.4ConfirmedBishop of Münster, Germany
5 May 170661.7DiedBishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Friedrich Christian von Plettenberg zu Lenhausen:
Bishop Friedrich Christian von Plettenberg zu Lenhausen (born , died ) Bishop of Münster

  • a priest for 17.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 272

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013