Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Tarcisio Pusma Ibáñez

Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Trujillo, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1967 Born
31 May 199730.1Ordained PriestPriest of Chulucanas, Peru
25 Jan 200840.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trujillo, Peru
25 Jan 200840.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Carpi
Aug 2008²41.2ResignedAuxiliary Bishop-Elect of Trujillo, Peru
Aug 2008²41.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Carpi

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tarcisio Pusma Ibáñez
Father Tarcisio Pusma Ibáñez (born ) Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Trujillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNangali

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Trujillo.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2008
  • ab/r: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast