Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Purcell, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ferns, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Apr 1519AppointedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
6 May 1519Ordained BishopBishop of Ferns, Ireland
20 Jul 1539DiedBishop of Ferns, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John Purcell
Bishop John Purcell O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Ferns

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 195
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1519, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 3 Jun 2018

Quantcast