Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pedro Prat Escalas, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of San León del Amazonas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1861BornNavarclés, Spain
1 Oct 187817.6ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
21 Mar 188524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
24 Oct 191150.6AppointedPrefect of San León del Amazonas, Peru
12 Feb 191452.9ResignedPrefect of San León del Amazonas, Peru
13 May 192968.2DiedPrefect Emeritus of San León del Amazonas, Peru

MicroData Summary for Pedro Prat Escalas:
Father Pedro Prat Escalas O.S.A. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of San León del Amazonas

  • a priest for 44.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 15 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Jul 2014