Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro de Ponte, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia

Titular See: Cluanense/Clunense/Cluense/Fina y Elvas?


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1466²Born
1 Jan 151246.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mallorca, Spain
8 Feb 151246.1Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Mallorca, Spain
1535¹69.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
3 May 154579.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Ponte:
Bishop Pedro de Ponte O.SS.T. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia

  • a bishop for 33.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 27, Number 85
  • bd: Website of the Diocese, 10 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Apr 2014