Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Detlef Pogwisch

Deceased

Bishop of Schleswig, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Dec 1499SelectedBishop of Schleswig, Germany
29 Jul 1502ConfirmedBishop of Schleswig, Germany
15 Jan 1507DiedBishop of Schleswig, Germany

MicroData Summary for Detlef Pogwisch
Bishop Detlef Pogwisch (died ) Bishop of Schleswig

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 239
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1502, Number 27*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast