Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ludovico Cardinal Podocathor

Deceased

Administrator of Benevento, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1429¹Born
14 Nov 148354.8AppointedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
28 Sep 150071.7Elevated to Cardinal
5 Oct 150071.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
20 Jan 150374.0AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
8 Jan 150475.0AppointedAdministrator of Benevento, Italy
25 Aug 150475.6DiedAdministrator of Benevento, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Podocathor (VIAF: 161339044)
Ludovico Cardinal Podocathor (born 1429, died ) Administrator of Benevento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNicosia, Archdiocese of Nicosia, Cyprus
Death PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria del Popolo, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 3.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Sep 1500
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 132

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast