Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomé de la Plaza

Deceased

Bishop of Valladolid, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1529³Born
14 Aug 158959.9AppointedBishop of Tui, Spain
18 Dec 159667.3AppointedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
10 Oct 160071.1DiedBishop of Valladolid, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé de la Plaza
Bishop Bartolomé de la Plaza (born , died ) Bishop of Valladolid

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMedinaceli, Diocese of Osma
Death PlaceValladolid, Diocese of Valladolid

Source(s):
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 321
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 102, Number 644
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 357
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1589, Number 15*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast