Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Platamone

Deceased

Bishop of Siracusa, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Feb 1517AppointedBishop of Sarno, Italy
18 Feb 1518AppointedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
30 May 1540DiedBishop of Siracusa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Platamone
Bishop Luigi Platamone (died ) Bishop of Siracusa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 293, and Page 307
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1517, Number 4*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 May 2018

Quantcast