Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Pisani

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Agathopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1720BornGioiosa Guardia
30 Mar 174323.1Ordained PriestPriest of Patti, Italy
18 Dec 178666.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
1787²66.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agathopolis

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Pisani
Bishop Giacomo Pisani (born ) Titular Bishop of Agathopolis

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 69
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1787, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016