Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Pineri

Deceased

Bishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1593Born
26 Jun 165662.7AppointedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
22 Jul 167177.8DiedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Pineri
Bishop Angelo Pineri (born , died ) Bishop of Marsico Nuovo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontefiascone

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 233
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast